Accounts and annual returns ST BARNABAS WITH CHRIST CHURCH PCC

Charity number: 1158894
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 December 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 December 2020 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 22 December 2019 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window