Financial history ST BARNABAS WITH CHRIST CHURCH PCC

Charity number: 1158894
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £103.19k £103.01k £97.07k £112.00k £112.29k
Total expenditure £112.15k £98.91k £113.45k £108.00k £105.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A