SIRIUS MINERALS FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1163127
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEIL IRVING Trustee 29 October 2015 None on record
Jacqueline Flynn Trustee 20 May 2020 None on record
IAN CAMERON SWALES Trustee 11 September 2018
THE LINK TEES VALLEY LTD Received: On time
William Buxton Woods Trustee 29 April 2021 None on record
Jonathan Samuel Trustee 23 November 2020 None on record
Dr Elizabeth Walmsley Trustee 09 March 2021
ROTARY CLUB OF STOKESLEY TRUST FUND Received: On time
SWAINBY VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
AIDS FREE BIRTHRIGHT FOR CHILDREN Received: On time
ANTI MODERN SLAVERY ALLIANCE Recently registered
Sir Martin James Narey Trustee 21 April 2021
NORTH MUSIC TRUST Received: On time