Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARY AND ST. EDWARD, WEST HANNINGFIELD

Charity number: 1164125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 06 August 2024 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 April 2021 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2023 1095 days late Download Open in new window