THE FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARY AND ST. EDWARD, WEST HANNINGFIELD

Charity number: 1164125
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £6.72k £7.59k £6.89k £26.46k £3.36k
Total expenditure £11.23k £7.50k £312 £7.49k £2.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A