Financial history THE SKILLS TRAINING & GROWTH ACADEMY

Charity number: 1161918
Charity reporting is overdue by 13 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £7.71k £8.57k £4.62k £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.31k £5.41k £3.20k £921 £1.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A