WINCHESTER SOCIAL ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1162372
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £0 £0 £1.27k £79.87k £171.70k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £11 £75.64k £156.52k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A