WINCHESTER SOCIAL ENTERPRISE

Charity number: 1162372

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Elizabeth Dyke Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
GAMBOL BEVERLEY PARKER Trustee 17 April 2015 None on record
JANE ANNABELLE BOYES Trustee 30 November 2015 None on record
VICTORIA LOUISE JAMES Trustee 09 April 2020 None on record
Rev ANDREW MARK MICKLEFIELD Trustee 30 November 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE RESURRECTION, ALTON Received: On time
THE HANTS-SURREY BORDER METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
THE KINGS ARMS (PETERSFIELD) Received: 2 days late
Rt Revd Dr Timothy John Dakin Chair 16 January 2015
ANGLICAN MISSIONERS OF AFRICA DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION TRUST Received: 30 days late
BISHOP OF WINCHESTER'S UGANDA CHURCH FUND
WINCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
WINCHESTER DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Trustee 12 February 2015
WEST TYTHERLEY FORMER TEACHERS HOUSE CHARITY Overdue by 31 days
ANDREW RONALD ROBINSON Trustee 12 February 2015
PORTSMOUTH NORTHSEA SWIM TRUST LTD Received: On time