Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND ST FRANCIS, BARCOMBE

Charity number: 1159084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £119.44k £114.54k £144.97k £137.91k £143.18k
Total expenditure £126.29k £132.80k £144.52k £136.61k £134.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £834 £1.07k N/A N/A £779