THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MATTHEW, BAYSWATER

Charity number: 1159099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev WILLIAM PAUL HUGH COLERIDGE Chair 01 July 2012 None on record
JOANNA MARGARET GRANT PETERKIN Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
James Alasdair Hugh Skillen Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record
MICHAEL HENRY VICKERY JEANS MBE Trustee 01 April 2013 None on record
ROBYN JISKE PENDER Trustee 14 April 2019
ENGLISH CATHEDRALS FUND Received: On time
Linda Dennis Trustee 30 April 2017 None on record
MARY ANORA YALE Trustee 01 April 1962 None on record
Elizabeth Kay Henderson Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
Rita Thorpe Trustee 12 June 2012 None on record
Florence Ajao Trustee 30 April 2012 None on record
James Laurence Kite Trustee 23 May 2021 None on record
Pauline Lorraine Hudson Evans Trustee 14 April 2019 None on record