TANKERSLEY SENIOR CITIZENS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 505208
Charity reporting is overdue by 778 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 47 days
Annual return 23 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 412 days
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 412 days
Annual return 23 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 778 days
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 778 days
Annual return 23 December 2017 15 January 2020 449 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 23 December 2016 15 January 2020 814 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 December 2016 Not Required