HOLY TRINITY PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1158868
Charity reporting is up to date (108 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To hold events and raise funds to be used to "enrich the lives of the pupils at Holy Trinity school".

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £10,721
Total expenditure: £27,167

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 2014: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HTPTA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert Britton Trustee 10 September 2019
None on record
Lucy Donaldson Trustee 12 September 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £23.74k £11.06k £6.43k £14.18k £10.72k
Total expenditure £9.63k £8.49k £2.20k £6.47k £27.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 16 October 2024 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 July 2023 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 12 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 23 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Holy Trinity School
Birmingham Road
Kidderminster
DY10 2BY
Phone:
01299269392