YORKSHIRE CAT RESCUE

Charity number: 1160138
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 24 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 01 April 2019 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 November 2016 On time Download