EDLESBOROUGH COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1160939
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £5.76k £2.65k £6.00k £910 £4.21k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £60 £65 £6.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £0 N/A N/A N/A