EDLESBOROUGH COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further enjoyment of Edlesborough Village Green by facilitating the regeneration of an existing pavilion and maintaining and operating the new pavilion for the good of the local sports clubs and community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 17 March 2015: CIO registration
- ECSC (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Woodcock | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ann Ferguson | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Plaats | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Walter | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dave Roberts | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sue Brown | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Meredith | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Fox | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.21k | £34.10k | £121.34k | £110.70k | £79.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.15k | £26.76k | £140.45k | £65.57k | £63.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 May 2023 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 21 May 2023 | 51 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 April 2022 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 24 April 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 17 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF EDLESBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY PAVILION AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A BUILDING FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Edlesborough Pavilion
The Green
Edlesborough
DUNSTABLE
Bedfordshire
LU6 2JF
- Phone:
- 01525221926
- Email:
- ajrwilliams@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window