EDLESBOROUGH COMMUNITY SPORTS CLUB CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1160939
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN WYNNE GOWER HOWELLS Trustee 17 March 2015 None on record
CHRISTOPHER NEVARD Trustee 17 March 2015 None on record
KENNETH HARRY HOLLOWAY Chair 17 March 2015 None on record
BRYAN JOHN HAMMONS Trustee 17 March 2015 None on record
Rebecca Cracknell Trustee 08 July 2017 None on record
GRAHAM DOUGLAS SIMPSON Trustee 17 March 2015
NEW LIFE CHURCH BEDFORDSHIRE TRUST Received: 120 days late
DUNSTABLE & HOUGHTON REGIS STREET PASTORS Received: On time
Dr Martyn Ray Jones Trustee 07 September 2020 None on record
Daniel Peter Johnstone Trustee 04 December 2020 None on record
Gary Anthony Daly Trustee 23 April 2015 None on record
ALAN JOHN RICHARD WILLIAMS Trustee 17 March 2015 None on record