THE SMILE OF ARRAN TRUST

Charity number: 1161262
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is involved in a number of fundraising activities to support our grants process to children and their families affected by a brain tumour or brain cancer

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 May 2024

Total income: £10,889
Total expenditure: £9,471

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Essex
  • Suffolk
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALISON TOSH Chair 24 April 2015
None on record
Joanna Snell Trustee 10 September 2015
None on record
STEPHEN TOSH Trustee 24 April 2015
None on record
CHLOE KATY CONNOLLY Trustee 24 April 2015
None on record
KERRY BOWIE Trustee 24 April 2015
None on record
ABBIE JANE TOSH Trustee 24 April 2015
None on record
JENNIFER KEMP Trustee 14 April 2015
None on record
TRACY MILLIGAN Trustee 14 April 2015
None on record
KATHLEEN MILLIGAN Trustee 24 March 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/05/2020 01/05/2021 01/05/2022 01/05/2023 01/05/2024
Total gross income £25.33k £17.32k £11.16k £12.72k £10.89k
Total expenditure £31.54k £16.95k £16.95k £10.22k £9.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 May 2024 10 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2023 29 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2022 14 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2021 22 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 May 2020 09 March 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 May 2020 09 March 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
18 Buccleuch Crescent
THORNHILL
Dumfriesshire
DG3 5AW
Phone:
07814232925