Trustees INVESTING IN PEOPLE AND CULTURE

Charity number: 1160482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jama Jama Chair 10 January 2017
None on record
Tanjong Tajocha Trustee 01 April 2022
None on record
AFI DOMETI Trustee 26 October 2017
None on record
JOHN NICHOLSON HINMAN Trustee 08 July 2016
TOGETHER MIDDLESBROUGH AND CLEVELAND
Received: On time
Dr MARK SUTCLIFFE Trustee 24 January 2016
THE PRINCE GEORGE GALITZINE MEMORIAL FUND FOR ST PETERSBURG
Received: On time
TOGETHER MIDDLESBROUGH AND CLEVELAND
Received: On time