HENFIELD LEISURE CENTRE

Charity number: 1159054
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £431.34k £509.48k £593.41k £539.87k
Total expenditure £0 £453.71k £469.08k £524.81k £548.59k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £78.99k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £509.48k £593.41k £539.87k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £468.28k £524.81k £548.59k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £800 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0