THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ON EAGLES' WINGS

Charity number: 1158591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 23 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 24 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 24 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 16 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 13 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required