THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD ON EAGLES' WINGS

Charity number: 1158591
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £17.65k £21.18k £37.43k £52.69k £71.82k
Total expenditure £21.70k £22.63k £26.08k £64.46k £47.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £25.00k