WOOLDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1159314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 17 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 05 October 2016 On time Download