Trustees WOOLDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1159314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Mitchell | Trustee | 05 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Caroline Boden | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
John William Lightfoot | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Quayle | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lightfoot-Wild | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Holly Lightfoot-Wild | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DEARNLEY | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER WALTON | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN FLEWERS | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MICHAEL HIRST | Trustee | 18 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TAYLOR | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Booth | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
William Richard Pearson | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.