WHADDON ROAD EVANGELICAL PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH

Charity number: 1159580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 February 2018 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 27 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 13 January 2017 On time Download