Race Equality North Somerset

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support and promote the rights and interests of Black, Asian and Minority Ethnic individuals groups and individuals by appropriate means, including advice, signposting, advocacy, referrals, training, and by acting as a focal point of contact for, and on behalf of, Minority Ethnic communities in North Somerset.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Somerset
Governance
- 01 July 2015: CIO registration
- 07 August 2015: Funds received from 1155141 NORTH SOMERSET BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC (BME) NET...
- Race Equality North Somerset (RENS) (Working name)
- NORTH SOMERSET BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC NETWORK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Noah | Chair | 22 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Clark | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lee Roberts | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
SAYD AHMED | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.31k | £21.68k | £115.85k | £176.48k | £98.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £13.65k | £70.67k | £202.14k | £38.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £109.79k | £164.68k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 01 Jul 2015 as amended on 06 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY WORKING WITH PEOPLE IN NORTH SOMERSET WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR ETHNIC ORIGIN AND TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PEOPLE AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY AND TO PROMOTE RACIAL HARMONY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC INCLUSION AND GOOD RACE RELATIONS BY ELIMINATING DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN THE RACIAL GROUPS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; ASSISTING IN THE DEVELOPMENT OF VOLUNTARY SECTOR ORGANISATIONS REPRESENTING THOSE PERSONS REFERRED TO ABOVE; PROMOTING THE EFFICIENT APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WORKING FOR THE BENEFIT OF OR FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF THE MINORITY ETHNIC VOLUNTARY SECTOR IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Race Equality North Somerset (RENS)
The Other Place
81-83 Meadow Street
Weston-super-Mare
North Somerset
BS23 1QL
- Phone:
- 03333355358
- Email:
- office@rens.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window