Accounts and annual returns 1215 COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1160926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2022 29 December 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 24 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 27 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 30 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 17 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required