Financial history 1215 COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1160926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £296 £238 £146 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £186 £142 £26 £26
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A