Financial history THE BLOCK WORKOUT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1161093
Charity reporting is up to date (42 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £60.97k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £14.98k £18.50k £61.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k