Trustees MANCHESTER AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1159052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Aaron Cornish Trustee 26 May 2023
None on record
Christopher Edmund HAIGHTON Trustee 04 March 2023
RIVINGTON PRESBYTERIAN CHAPEL (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)
Received: On time
BRIDGEWATER SCHOOL
Received: 21 days late
Canon Adrian Rhodes Trustee 04 March 2023
None on record
Peter McEvitt Trustee 26 February 2022
None on record
Natasha DeVoe Trustee 09 September 2021
None on record
Michael Green Trustee 11 March 2021
None on record
Mark Rendall Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
Ron Birrell Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
Anthony Lomax Trustee 22 February 2020
None on record
Christine MacLeod Trustee 02 March 2019
None on record