FRIENDS OF MARDEN'S HERITAGE

Charity number: 1160682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 01 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 10 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required