FRIENDS OF MARDEN'S HERITAGE

Charity number: 1160682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.13k £9.43k £4.66k £10.38k £7.58k
Total expenditure £9.76k £9.19k £3.97k £9.40k £6.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A