FRIENDS OF MARDEN'S HERITAGE

Charity number: 1160682
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DEIRDRE COLQUHOUN COOK Trustee 21 April 2010 None on record
SANDRA BOURNE Trustee 18 May 2019
MARDEN PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL Received: On time
CAROL ANNE HOGG Trustee 19 March 2012 None on record
BARBARA DUBOIS Trustee 30 April 2015 None on record
BRIAN WOODGATE Trustee 01 April 2009
MARDEN PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL Received: On time
MR STEVE MCARRAGHER Trustee 01 April 2009 None on record
Lucie Green Chair 30 April 2019 None on record