THE FRIENDS OF ST MILDRED'S, TENTERDEN KENT

Charity number: 1159264
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2019 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 25 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 16 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 15 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 24 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required