LEASEHOLD KNOWLEDGE PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1162584
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanne Darbyshire Trustee 01 September 2018 None on record
Liam Philip Spender Trustee 05 March 2021 None on record
Kate Jane Kendrick Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
Dean Edward Buckner Trustee 22 August 2018 None on record
MARTIN BOYD Trustee 19 April 2021 None on record
Catherine Ann Williams Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record