SOUTH SHEFFIELD COMMUNITY INITIATIVES LTD

Charity number: 1159717
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 02 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 17 February 2018 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)