Financial history SOUTH SHEFFIELD COMMUNITY INITIATIVES LTD

Charity number: 1159717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £20.47k £18.99k £23.88k £34.95k £32.49k
Total expenditure £12.84k £14.74k £24.91k £17.47k £19.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.22k £12.88k £11.46k £23.46k £24.45k