Trustees RETHINKING ECONOMICS INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1158972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alexander Kay Whinnom Trustee 02 April 2022
HEATON MERSEY YOUTH FESTIVAL
Received: On time
James Meadway Trustee 02 April 2022
None on record
Peter Edward Stimpson Trustee 02 April 2022
None on record
Paula Noreen Woodman Trustee 02 April 2022
None on record
Bethan Hannah Hunt Trustee 02 April 2022
None on record
Bandile Andile Nkululeko Ngidi Trustee 02 April 2022
None on record
Samiah Anderson Trustee 20 March 2021
None on record
Toke Dahler-Larsen Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Dr Mehroosh Tak Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Antonia Jennings Trustee 26 January 2019
None on record
Ben Michael Pringle Trustee 08 April 2017
None on record