MYOTONIC DYSTROPHY FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Myotonic Dystrophy Foundation UK funds basic and translational research focused on finding treatments and a cure for myotonic dystrophy, and, advocacy efforts to improve access to care and enhance the regulatory pathway.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 24 March 2015: Standard registration
- 28 April 2025: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- Myotonic: My Cause. My Cure. (Working name)
- THE WYCK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- WYCK FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.69k | £33.15k | £85.88k | £7.49k | £54.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £647.62k | £193.43k | £72.90k | £2.20k | £14.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/12/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/03/2015 as amended on 21 Aug 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND NEED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) SUPPORTING, COMMISSIONING OR UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF MYOTONIC DYSTROPHY CONDITIONS AND TO PUBLISH OR DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT; AND B) SUPPORTING OTHER INITIATIVES THAT PROVIDE OR SUPPORT THE CARE AND RELIEF OF SUFFERERS OF MYOTONIC DYSTROPHY CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES AS APPROPRIATE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window