EASTLEIGH BASICS BANK

Charity number: 1158825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £57.59k £35.80k £50.23k £48.52k £58.58k
Total expenditure £43.93k £38.67k £43.14k £38.08k £59.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £0 £0 N/A N/A