ANIMAL CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1163828
Charity reporting is up to date (215 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 01 October 2021 215 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 01 October 2021 215 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 04 November 2019 On time
Annual return 30 April 2018 28 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 01 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 17 April 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 18 April 2018 49 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2016 07 March 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 04 April 2018 400 days late Download