Trustees THE POLICE ARBORETUM MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1159831
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin James Hewitt QPM Chair 04 June 2019
None on record
Gavin John Stephens QPM Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
James William Slessor Trustee 13 June 2023
None on record
Clive Richard Critchley Trustee 16 September 2022
POLICE ROLL OF HONOUR TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID WILBRAHAM Trustee 06 June 2022
POLICE ROLL OF HONOUR TRUST
Received: On time
George Clarke Trustee 07 March 2022
None on record
Marc Stuart Jones Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Rachel Julie Swann QPM Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Martin Jelley QPM Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
John Partington Trustee 12 November 2019
None on record
Giles Tristan York QPM Trustee 11 September 2018
None on record
Martyn Stanley Underhill MBE Trustee 09 March 2018
WIMBORNE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SAFEWISE
Charity is insolvent
Michael Jon Foster QPM Trustee 03 September 2014
None on record