HIGHBURY CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity number: 1159085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 12 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 12 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 06 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 26 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 26 April 2016 On time Download