HIGHBURY CONGREGATIONAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing church buildings,regular worship services,venue for community groups,activities for parents and pre-school children,facilities suitable for elderly people,comfort for the bereaved,visitation for the sick,support for those in need. Conducting weddings and funerals. Promoting spiritual welfare of children,young people and all others,youth club activities,healthy phsical activities,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 05 November 2014: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BARBARA LOUISE MIDDLETON | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Ruth Wyatt | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darryl John Mills | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Simpson Buchanan | Trustee | 03 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Blazey | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Jason Clare Boyd | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.37k | £155.36k | £84.73k | £103.84k | £91.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.21k | £154.59k | £84.75k | £82.88k | £103.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 08 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2021
(These accounts |
18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 JUN 2009
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES AND USAGES FOR THE TIME BEING OF CONGREGATIONALISM AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH ANY SPECIFIC REQUIREMENTS IN THE FOUNDATION TRUSTS. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION RELIEVE NEED AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Highbury Congregational Church
Priory Walk
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL52 6DU
- Phone:
- 01242522050
- Email:
- highburyoffice@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window