Accounts and annual returns THE PEACE CENTRE UGANDA

Charity number: 1160583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2021 25 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 25 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 12 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 12 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 17 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 17 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 16 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 16 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2017 20 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 21 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window