MARY SEACOLE DAY NURSERY AND FAMILY SUPPORT UNIT

Charity number: 1162115
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 March 2021 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 March 2021 34 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 August 2020 204 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 August 2020 204 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 April 2019 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 20 April 2019 79 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 March 2018 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 02 March 2018 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 July 2017 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 July 2017 173 days late Download