MARY SEACOLE DAY NURSERY AND FAMILY SUPPORT UNIT

Charity number: 1162115
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £0 £268.11k £328.87k £330.73k £308.47k
Total expenditure £0 £282.24k £321.78k £327.80k £392.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £3.06k £3.68k £1.14k N/A