JEREMY ALEXANDER SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 1160510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £30.00k £20.05k £80.00k £78.67k £100.04k
Total expenditure £10.98k £29.88k £77.25k £93.71k £103.13k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A