THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION 2014

Charity number: 1160157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.32m £3.58m £9.17m £4.39m £2.77m
Total expenditure £4.43m £4.79m £4.32m £4.26m £3.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.86k £25.91k £96.51k £7.81k £3.35k
Income - Other trading activities £171.11k £173.02k £169.97k £152.07k £138.98k
Income - Charitable activities £1.89m £1.83m £1.15m £646.36k £603.57k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.23m £1.18m £1.20m £1.23m £962.73k
Income - Other £25.27k £374.94k £6.55m £2.35m £1.07m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £42.71k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.28m £4.67m £4.21m £4.14m £3.62m
Expenditure - Raising funds £150.99k £125.40k £117.57k £117.30k £108.26k
Expenditure - Governance £167.55k £100.97k £57.08k £55.56k £47.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £125.90k £125.40k £117.57k £117.30k £108.26k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0