Trustees THE COAL INDUSTRY SOCIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION 2014

Charity number: 1160157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DAVID JONATHAN DUNN Trustee 27 February 2023
CHERRYTREE
Received: On time
CHERRYTREE SUPPORT SERVICES LIMITED
Received: 76 days late
TAPTONHOLME
Received: On time
Richard Nield Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Michael Laing Trustee 22 September 2022
None on record
Helen Anne Lentle Trustee 22 September 2022
DYSLECSIA CYMRU / WALES DYSLEXIA
Overdue by 290 days
David Paul Steer Trustee 23 September 2021
None on record
Michael Macdonald Trustee 23 January 2020
SHEFFIELD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: 16 days late
Carole Langrick Trustee 09 November 2015
TEESSIDE HOSPICE CARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Patrick Matthew Carragher Trustee 31 October 2014
NATIONAL COAL MINING MUSEUM FOR ENGLAND TRUST LTD
Received: On time
CHRISTINE KAYE Trustee 02 July 2014
None on record
Rev Robert Cooper Trustee 02 July 2014
SOCIETY OF THE SACRED MISSION
Received: On time
CISWO CHARITABLE PROPERTY SERVICES TRUST
Received: On time
JOHN HUMBLE Trustee 02 July 2014
None on record
JONATHAN LESLIE HATTERSLEY Trustee 02 July 2014
CISWO CHARITABLE PROPERTY SERVICES TRUST
Received: On time