Accounts and annual returns NUHA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1160523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 27 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 13 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 13 February 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 28 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window